Global Patent Index - EP 1011985 A1

EP 1011985 A1 2000-06-28 - METHOD AND MACHINE FOR AUTOMATIC DOCUMENT ASSEMBLY BY MEANS OF BOLTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND MACHINE FOR AUTOMATIC DOCUMENT ASSEMBLY BY MEANS OF BOLTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄTESYSTEM ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN BINDEN VON DOKUMENTEN MITTELS ÖSEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET MACHINE D'ASSEMBLAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE DOCUMENTS PAR CRAMPONS

Publication

EP 1011985 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948959 A

Priority

  • DE 19739801 A
  • EP 9805785 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19739801A1] Disclosed is a printing or copying machine comprising a device for automatic document assembly by means of bolts (17). For that purpose, the thickness of the loose sheet (11) work is determined, on the basis of which bolts are cut to length in a reserve of tubular material (16). A positioning device positions the bolts (17) into the perforations of the work. Said bolts are then compressed by means of stamps (18), resulting in the formation of non removable closing tips.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42B 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42B 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42B 5/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912745A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739801 A1 19990311; EP 1011985 A1 20000628; EP 1011985 B1 20020327; WO 9912745 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120910

2013-07-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803550

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120910

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111005

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-09-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803550 20020502

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010608

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB