Global Patent Index - EP 1012025 A1

EP 1012025 A1 2000-06-28 - AID SYSTEM FOR STEERING A MOTOR VEHICLE IN PARTICULAR FOR COMING ALONGSIDE A STATION PLATFORM

Title (en)

AID SYSTEM FOR STEERING A MOTOR VEHICLE IN PARTICULAR FOR COMING ALONGSIDE A STATION PLATFORM

Title (de)

ASSISTIERENDES SYSTEM ZUM FÜHREN EINES FAHRZEUGS, INSBESONDERE BEI DER ANNÄHERUNG AN EINE HALTESTELLE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ASSISTANCE A LA CONDUITE D'UN VEHICULE, NOTAMMENT POUR L'ACCOSTAGE A UN QUAI

Publication

EP 1012025 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97919089 A

Priority

  • FR 9701614 W
  • FR 9610789 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2752807A1] The system is provided for helping a driver approach a stop (14) or kerb in a vehicle (10), especially a public transport vehicle. The system includes a number of straight lines (16) marked on the roadway at the entrance of a bus station and which follows a path to the required bus stop. A device on board the vehicle such as a video camera points forward and is used to view the lines (16) and the image is then used by a processing device to apply a couple using a motor to the steering column in order to guide the vehicle to its stop. On either side of the straight line markings are additional straight lines (R1,R2) which are used to assist in determining deviation of the vehicle path from the desired path and make necessary corrections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B62D 1/28; G05D 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 1/28 (2006.01); G05D 1/02 (2006.01); G05D 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05D 1/0225 (2013.01); B62D 1/28 (2013.01); G05D 1/0234 (2013.01); G05D 1/0246 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914096A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2752807 A1 19980306; FR 2752807 B1 19981009; DE 69718068 D1 20030130; DE 69718068 T2 20030904; EP 1012025 A1 20000628; EP 1012025 B1 20021218; ES 2185931 T3 20030501; SK 3432000 A3 20001107; WO 9914096 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160915

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2185931

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69718068

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-30

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69718068

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT VEHICULES INDUSTRIELS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DARLOT, DANIEL

2000-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LADREYT, THIERRY

2000-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LEZY, PATRICK

2000-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PONCET, BRUNO

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000229

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT