Global patent index - EP 1012050 A2

EP 1012050 A2 2000-06-28 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LABELLING FLAT ITEMS OF POST

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LABELLING FLAT ITEMS OF POST

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ETIKETTIEREN VON FLACHEN SENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ETIQUETER DES ENVOIS PLATS

Publication

EP 1012050 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 97910243 A

Priority

  • DE 9702252 W
  • DE 19642110 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19642110A1] The invention concerns a method of labelling flat items of post (1), labels (9) being applied to these items in the labelling region of a transport section (2) by a cutting and application station (3). To that end, the items of post are guided in a frictionally engaged manner in the labelling region such that the labelling zones on these items of post remain free and the items of post are positioned by suction air with respect to a sliding track.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 1/02 (2006.01); B65C 9/02 (2006.01); B65C 9/18 (2006.01); B65C 9/28 (2006.01); B65C 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/02 (2013.01); B65C 1/02 (2013.01); B65C 9/1803 (2013.01); B65C 9/28 (2013.01); B65C 9/34 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1062 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1339 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1773 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9816904A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19642110 A1 19980423; DE 19642110 C2 19981126; EP 1012050 A2 20000628; EP 1012050 B1 20020109; US 6391132 B1 20020521; WO 9816904 A2 19980423; WO 9816904 A3 19980611

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040907

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031117

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020406

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59706146

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-28

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS DEMATIC AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990406

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB