Global Patent Index - EP 1012052 A1

EP 1012052 A1 2000-06-28 - PACKAGING FOR A PASTE PRODUCT

Title (en)

PACKAGING FOR A PASTE PRODUCT

Title (de)

VERPACKUNG FÜR EIN PASTENFÖRMIGES PRODUKT

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE POUR PRODUIT PATEUX

Publication

EP 1012052 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945295 A

Priority

  • DE 19739333 A
  • EP 9805482 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19739333A1] The invention relates to a packaging for a paste product, in the form of a flexible, closed storage drum which has a sealable outlet opening on the underside. Said opening can be connected to a metering device which conveys the product using negative pressure. The aim of the invention is to provide a simple means of safely, practically entirely emptying a drum of this type. To this end, the flexible storage drum (1) is configured with a thinner wall in its upper area (2) than in its lower area (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/02 (2006.01); D06F 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/0292 (2013.01); D06F 39/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912816A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739333 A1 19990311; AT 234761 T 20030415; CA 2303411 A1 19990318; CA 2303411 C 20070605; DK 1012052 T3 20030714; EP 1012052 A1 20000628; EP 1012052 B1 20030319; ES 2195389 T3 20031201; NO 20001166 A 20000307; NO 20001166 D0 20000307; US 6568570 B1 20030527; WO 9912816 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59807573

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070829

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ECOLAB G.M.B.H. & CO. OHG

- Effective date: 20040831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060829

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060829

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-03-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-03-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ECOLAB G.M.B.H. & CO. OHG

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040830

2004-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040829

2004-08-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040829

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1012052E

2003-10-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031015

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-08-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030813

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030806

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-04 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20030804

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-06-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030401680

2003-06-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807573 P 20030424

2003-04-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOLAB GMBH & CO. OHG

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000229

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE