Global Patent Index - EP 1012068 A1

EP 1012068 A1 2000-06-28 - DEVICE FOR STORING A LIQUID, PARTICULARLY A DILUTABLE CONCENTRATE, CO-OPERABLE WITH A SPRAY DISPENSER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR STORING A LIQUID, PARTICULARLY A DILUTABLE CONCENTRATE, CO-OPERABLE WITH A SPRAY DISPENSER

Title (de)

MIT EINER SPRÜHVORRICHTUNG KOMBINIERBARER FLÜSSIGKEITSPEICHER, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN LÖSBARES KONZENTRAT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'UN LIQUIDE, NOTAMMENT D'UN CONCENTRE POUVANT ETRE DILUE, DESTINE A FONCTIONNER AVEC UN ELEMENT DE VAPORISATION

Publication

EP 1012068 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98913707 A

Priority

  • EP 98913707 A
  • EP 9801418 W
  • EP 97200929 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867381A1] The invention relates to a device for storing a liquid, particularly a dilutable concentrate such as a detergent concentrate or the like, said device being cooperable with a spray dispenser bottle (2) and a spray dispenser head which together form a spray dispenser, the device comprising: a top wall (12) and a bottom wall (24), said top wall (12) and bottom wall (24) being separated by one or more side walls (18), the top and bottom wall (12,24) each having an opening continuous with a channel (20) running through the device from the top wall opening (14) to the bottom wall opening (22), whereby the top, bottom and sidewalls together with the channel (20), define at least one reservoir area of the device wherein liquid (32) is storable, said device further comprising exit creating means for creating an exit (42) in said device by relative displacement of parts thereof, whereby liquid is releasable from the reservoir area. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14; B05B 11/00; B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/0078 (2013.01); B05B 11/3057 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843895A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867381 A1 19980930; BR 9808982 A 20000801; EP 1012068 A1 20000628; EP 1012068 B1 20021120; WO 9843895 A1 19981008

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150311

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160326

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160428

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150310

2015-12-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150311

2015-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-01 [REG NL PLEX] LIFTING OF FORMER PLEDGE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLEX

- Effective date: 20120724

2011-05-12 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: DIVERSEY, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20110429

2011-04-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2010-11-17 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20101028

2010-06-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DIVERSEY, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: JOHNSONDIVERSEY, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2186146

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69809570

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-02

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-10-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHNSONDIVERSEY, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011228

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990826

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE