Global Patent Index - EP 1012073 A1

EP 1012073 A1 2000-06-28 - RIGID CONTAINER FOR TRANSPORTING A BAG CONTAINING BIO-PHARMACEUTICAL FLUID PRODUCTS

Title (en)

RIGID CONTAINER FOR TRANSPORTING A BAG CONTAINING BIO-PHARMACEUTICAL FLUID PRODUCTS

Title (de)

STEIFER TRANSPORTBEHÄLTER FÜR EINEN BEUTEL MIT BIOLOGISCHEN UND PHARMAZEUTISCHEN FLIESSFÄHIGEN PRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

CONTENEUR RIGIDE DE TRANSPORT POUR UNE POCHE CONTENANT DES PRODUITS FLUIDES BIO-PHARMACEUTIQUES

Publication

EP 1012073 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99929376 A

Priority

  • FR 9901582 W
  • FR 9808644 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2780708A1] The invention concerns a rigid container for a flexible bag transporting bio-pharmaceutical fluid having a volume of 50 litres or more consisting of a bottom wall and one or several side walls (1, 2, 3, 4) whereof the top part is provided with a plate retaining (5) the bag, adjustable in height for compressing said bag.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/04; B65D 88/60; B67D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/02 (2006.01); B65D 88/12 (2006.01); B65D 88/60 (2006.01); B65D 90/04 (2006.01); B67D 7/02 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/0216 (2013.01); B65D 88/60 (2013.01); B65D 90/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001596A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2780708 A1 20000107; FR 2780708 B1 20010112; AT 214027 T 20020315; AU 4621299 A 20000124; AU 764887 B2 20030904; CA 2302826 A1 20000113; CA 2302826 C 20070403; CN 1168645 C 20040929; CN 1274332 A 20001122; DE 69900968 D1 20020411; DE 69900968 T2 20021128; DK 1012073 T3 20020701; EP 1012073 A1 20000628; EP 1012073 B1 20020306; ES 2172336 T3 20020916; JP 2002519263 A 20020702; JP 4316807 B2 20090819; PT 1012073 E 20020731; US 6076457 A 20000620; WO 0001596 A1 20000113

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SARTORIUS STEDIM FMT SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SARTORIUS STEDIM BIOTECH, AUBAGNE, FR

- Document: DE 69900968

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69900968

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69900968

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SARTORIUS STEDIM FMT SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20140602

2014-06-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69900968

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

2014-04-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140320 AND 20140326

2014-02-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SARTORIUS STEDIM FMT SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SARTORIUS STEDIM BIOTECH, FR

2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090702

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090702

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-07-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080702

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2010-04-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090204

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090102

2009-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-03-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-01-14 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090102

2008-11-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080714

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080703

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080711

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080721

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SARTORIUS STEDIM BIOTECH

2008-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2008-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SARTORIUS STEDIM BIOTECH

- Free text: STEDIM S.A.#Z.I. DES PALUDS, AVENUE DE JOCQUES, BOITE POSTALE 1051#13781 AUBAGNE CEDEX (FR) -TRANSFER TO- SARTORIUS STEDIM BIOTECH#ZONE INDUSTRIELLE DES PALUDS AVENUE DE JOUQUES#13400 AUBAGNE (FR)

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070716

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-16 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20070816

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-01 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-06-27 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20050627

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-09-26 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020402240

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172336 T3

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020408

2002-07-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900968 20020411

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214027 T 20020315

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010314

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE