Global patent index - EP 1012094 A1

EP 1012094 A1 2000-06-28 - COILING APPARATUS

Title (en)

COILING APPARATUS

Title (de)

WICKELVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE BOBINAGE

Publication

EP 1012094 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97906409 A

Priority

  • SE 9700351 W
  • SE 9600776 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9731849A1] The invention relates to a winding apparatus (1) having several winding reels (3-6) provided side by side and driven by a common drive shaft (2) and having a distribution and equalization mechanism (9, 12, 13, 16, 17, 18, 19, 22, 23, 24, 25) in the form of a gear mechanism for equalizing the driving force between the reels. According to the invention the distribution and equalization mechanism comprises two or several steps (9, 12, 13, 16, 17 and 18, 19, 22, 23, 24, 25, respectively) acting coaxially around the shaft and around each other and provided radially outside each other and within the radial as well as the total axial extension of the reels (3-6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/106 (2013.01); B65H 2405/45 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9731849A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9731849 A1 19970904; AT 239656 T 20030515; DE 69721842 D1 20030612; DE 69721842 T2 20031120; EP 1012094 A1 20000628; EP 1012094 B1 20030507; SE 507246 C2 19980427; SE 9600776 D0 19960228; SE 9600776 L 19970829

INPADOC legal status

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-02-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2004-05-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69721842

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980813

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT