Global Patent Index - EP 1012095 A1

EP 1012095 A1 2000-06-28 - DEVICE IN A REEL-UP IN A PAPER MACHINE

Title (en)

DEVICE IN A REEL-UP IN A PAPER MACHINE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG IN EINER WICKELEINRICHTUNG IN EINER PAPIERMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'UNE ENROULEUSE DE MACHINE A PAPIER

Publication

EP 1012095 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917910 A

Priority

  • SE 9800698 W
  • SE 9701401 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846510A1] A device in a reel-up (3) in a paper machine in which paper is produced in a web running in the reel-up (3) and supported by a surface winding drum (2) and wound onto exchangeable reeling drums (6) in contact with the surface winding drum (2) in order to form reels of paper, for applying an adhesive agent on the web when changing full-width reels and in the event of web ruptures in the reel-up. According to the invention a shield (7) is mounted on the stand (9) of the reel-up, upstream of the surface winding drum, and extending transversely to the machine direction. A spray nozzle mounting rack (8), supported by the shield, extends transversely to the web across its entire width and comprises a plurality of nozzles (5) distributed uniformly across the web to spread spray jets of liquid containing said adhesive agent onto the web to form a coherent adhesive area perpendicular to the machine direction, said adhesive area being brought into contact with an empty reeling drum or an already commenced reel of paper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/28; B65H 21/00; B65H 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/22 (2006.01); B65H 19/28 (2006.01); B65H 26/02 (2006.01); B65H 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 37/02 (2013.01); B65H 19/2261 (2013.01); B65H 19/286 (2013.01); B65H 26/025 (2013.01); B65H 2406/211 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01); B65H 2801/84 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846510A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846510 A1 19981022; AT 254574 T 20031215; DE 1012095 T1 20010405; DE 69819914 D1 20031224; DE 69819914 T2 20040902; EP 1012095 A1 20000628; EP 1012095 B1 20031119; SE 509117 C2 19981207; SE 9701401 D0 19970416; SE 9701401 L 19981017

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-07-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: VALMET AKTIEBOLAG, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: HC

- Ref Document Number: 254574

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140612

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VALMET AB, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69819914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69819914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: VALMET AKTIEBOLAG, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20140305

2014-03-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69819914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

2014-02-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AB, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69819914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140102

2014-02-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VALMET AB, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69819914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140102

2014-02-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69819914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

- Effective date: 20140102

2013-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AKTIEBOLAG, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 254574

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130918

2013-08-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AB, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69819914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130709

2013-08-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VALMET AB, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69819914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130709

2013-08-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69819914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

- Effective date: 20130828

2013-08-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69819914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

- Effective date: 20130709

2013-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69819914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LORENZ & KOLLEGEN PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2013-06-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130509 AND 20130515

2013-05-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AKTIEBOLAG, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20130404

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69819914

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ANDERSSON, TOMMY, GOERAN

2003-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: EKLUND, TOMAS, AKE

2003-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LIND, ROLF, GUNNAR

2003-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SVANQVIST, TORD, OLOF, SIXTEN

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AKTIEBOLAG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-05 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2000-12-22 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2000-12-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCAT

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991008

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT