Global Patent Index - EP 1012098 A1

EP 1012098 A1 2000-06-28 - DEVICE FOR CONVEYING FOLDED SIGNATURES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONVEYING FOLDED SIGNATURES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSPORTIEREN GEFALZTER SIGNATUREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR TRANSPORTER DES SIGNATURES PLIEES

Publication

EP 1012098 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97911133 A

Priority

  • DE 9702279 W
  • DE 19642118 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19642118A1] The invention concerns a device for conveying and distributing folded signature (24, 26), wherein the signatures removed from the bucket wheel (2) of a folding apparatus by means of a gripper chain (6) are distributed to preselectable distribution points (A, B, C, D, E). The signatures are each transferred by means of a controllable switching unit, for example in the form of a motorized cam plate (33 to 37) which can be controlled or regulated. To that end, the switching cams are disposed in a switching or in a non-switching position on the cam plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/04 (2006.01); B65H 29/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/003 (2013.01); B65H 29/60 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44712 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44732 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44765 (2013.01); B65H 2402/546 (2013.01); B65H 2405/58 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2301/44712 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/02
  2. B65H 2301/44712 + B65H 2220/01
  3. B65H 2301/44765 + B65H 2220/02
  4. B65H 2301/44732 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/09

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9816452A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19642118 A1 19980423; DE 19642118 C2 19991209; DE 59706120 D1 20020228; EP 1012098 A1 20000628; EP 1012098 B1 20020102; ES 2168616 T3 20020616; JP 2000503959 A 20000404; JP 3249137 B2 20020121; US 6179111 B1 20010130; WO 9816452 A1 19980423

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071004

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071005

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071005

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071004

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071005

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071004

2008-06-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061006

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168616 T3

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59706120 20020228

2002-01-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020104

2002-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010521

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990507

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE