Global Patent Index - EP 1012099 A1

EP 1012099 A1 2000-06-28 - DEVICE FOR HANDLING SHEET-LIKE PIECES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR HANDLING SHEET-LIKE PIECES

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG BLATTARTIGER FÖRDERGUTSTÜCKE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION DE PIECES DE MANUTENTION EN FORME DE FEUILLE

Publication

EP 1012099 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948939 A

Priority

  • DE 19739784 A
  • EP 9805727 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19739784A1] With regard to an installation designed to handle sheet-like pieces by means of gripper arms (1) provided with gripper clutches (9, 10), a particularly simple and economical structure requiring less components can be obtained by a design according to which the distribution crankshaft gear carries a distributing disk with operating cams (18, 18a, 18a, 113) for enabling oscillatory movements by the gripper arm (1), said disk interacting with the cam follower (17) in an actuating mechanism which is coupled with the swivelling gripper clutch (10) of the clamping device (3) and mounted on the gripper arm (1). The distributing disk has been specially designed for that purpose.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/10 (2006.01); B65H 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/14 (2013.01); B65H 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912836A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739784 A1 19990311; CA 2303170 A1 19990318; CA 2303170 C 20070522; EP 1012099 A1 20000628; EP 1012099 B1 20011205; US 6419223 B1 20020716; WO 9912836 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150908

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150908

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59802367

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-05-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-02-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PITNEY BOWES DEUTSCHLAND GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-11-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PITNEY BOWES DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020308

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802367

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PITNEY BOWES TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010503

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000229

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI