Global Patent Index - EP 1012106 A1

EP 1012106 A1 2000-06-28 - DEVICE FOR CLOSING DRINKS CONTAINERS WITH SEALING CAPS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CLOSING DRINKS CONTAINERS WITH SEALING CAPS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN VON GETRÄNKEBEHÄLTERN MIT VERSCHLUSSKAPPEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR FERMER DES CONTENANTS A BOISSONS AVEC DES ELEMENTS DE FERMETURE

Publication

EP 1012106 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948902 A

Priority

  • DE 19739327 A
  • EP 9805586 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19739327A1] The invention relates to a device for closing drinks containers with sealing caps, comprising a transfer device for transferring said caps from a single-track cap conveyor to the bottles. The inventive device is characterised in that a bottle conveyor is provided to transport the bottles in parallel rows on several tracks and that the transfer device is configured in such a manner that it takes up the requisite number of caps for a row of containers from said cap conveyor, brings them into a target position above the containers of one row and grasps them from above in said target position by means of cap carriers, before placing them on the containers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67B 3/06 (2006.01); B67C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67B 3/06 (2013.01); B67C 7/0033 (2013.01); B67C 2007/0066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912841A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739327 A1 19990318; DE 19739327 C2 19990701; EP 1012106 A1 20000628; EP 1012106 B1 20050413; US 6393800 B1 20020528; WO 9912841 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111122

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KHS MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU A.G.

- Effective date: 20050930

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060116

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-08-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-07-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050724

2005-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812737 P 20050519

2005-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2005-04-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KHS MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAUAKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALFILL ENGINEERING GMBH & CO., KG.

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI