Global patent index - EP 1012128 A1

EP 1012128 A1 2000-06-28 - A PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF RECYCLED ORGANIC WASTE

Title (en)

A PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF RECYCLED ORGANIC WASTE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WIEDERVERWENDETEN ORGANISCHEN ABFALLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR RECYCLER DES DECHETS ORGANIQUES

Publication

EP 1012128 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98912148 A

Priority

  • AU 9800221 W
  • AU PO601197 A
  • AU PO617397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845229A1] A process for the production of recycled material from organic waste wherein the organic waste is used as feed for earthworms such that the recycled material is produced by the earthworms as castings, wherein the feeding conditions for the earthworms are maintained such that at least part of the castings is produced in liquid form. The earthworms can be maintained in a substantially closed vessel, in a bed of said organic waste in the vessel. The bed of organic waste may have at least an upper layer substantially in the range 2 to 3 centimetres in depth, and may be provided in an oxygen rich atmosphere. The vessel may also include means for collecting the liquid castings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C05F 17/02; A01K 67/033; C05F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/033 (2006.01); C05F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C05F 17/0009 (2013.01); A01K 67/0332 (2013.01); C05F 17/0072 (2013.01); Y02P 20/145 (2015.11); Y02W 30/43 (2015.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845229 A1 19981015; CA 2327183 A1 19981015; EP 1012128 A1 20000628; EP 1012128 A4 20010328

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011116

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICSUNESCU, VICTOR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MICSUNESCU, VICTOR

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-03-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE