Global patent index - EP 1012150 A1

EP 1012150 A1 2000-06-28 - HETEROARYLCARBOXAMIDE COMPOUNDS ACTIVE AGAINST PROTEIN TYROSINE KINASE RELATED DISORDERS

Title (en)

HETEROARYLCARBOXAMIDE COMPOUNDS ACTIVE AGAINST PROTEIN TYROSINE KINASE RELATED DISORDERS

Title (de)

HETEROARYLCARBOXAMID-VERBINDUNGEN DIE GEGEN DURCH PROTEIN-TYROSIN-KINASE VERURSACHTE KRANKHEITEN WIRKSAM SIND

Title (fr)

COMPOSES D'HETEROARYLCARBOXAMIDE ACTIFS CONTRE LES ETATS PATHOLOGIQUES LIES AUX PROTEINE TYROSINE KINASES

Publication

EP 1012150 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98924794 A

Priority

  • US 9810174 W
  • US 4708497 P
  • US 4694597 P
  • US 5662397 P
  • US 6159097 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852944A1] The present invention relates to novel heteroarylcarboxamides which modulate the activity of protein tyrosine kinases and are expected to be useful in the treatment of abnormal protein tyrosine kinase activity driven disorders, to methods for the treatment of inappropriate FGFR activity related disorders with the heteroarylcarboxamide, N-(4-trifluoromethyl-phenyl)-5-methylisoxazole-4-carboxamide, and to the treatment of solid tumor cancers, especially glioblastoma and astrocytoma, with a combination of a nitrosourea, preferably BCNU (carmustin) and N-(4-trifluoromethyl-phenyl)-5-methylisoxazole-4-carboxamide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 413/02; C07D 231/12; C07D 261/08; C07D 261/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 231/12 (2006.01); C07D 261/18 (2006.01); C07D 277/32 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 413/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 277/32 (2013.01); C07D 261/18 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 413/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852944 A1 19981126; AR 015685 A1 20010516; AU 7687998 A 19981211; CA 2302438 A1 19981126; EP 1012150 A1 20000628; EP 1012150 A4 20020529

INPADOC legal status

2007-04-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060927

2005-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUGEN, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040204

2002-05-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020411

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07D 413/02 A, 7C 07D 231/12 B, 7C 07D 261/18 B, 7C 07D 261/08 B, 7C 07D 413/12 B, 7C 07D 231/14 B, 7C 07D 401/12 B, 7C 07D 407/12 B, 7C 07D 275/02 B, 7C 07D 417/12 B, 7A 61K 31/42 B, 7A 61K 31/415 B, 7A 61K 31/44 B, 7A 61K 31/425 B

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE