Global Patent Index - EP 1012190 A1

EP 1012190 A1 2000-06-28 - EOSINOPHIL EOTAXIN RECEPTOR

Title (en)

EOSINOPHIL EOTAXIN RECEPTOR

Title (de)

Eotaxinrezeptor aus Eosinophilen

Title (fr)

RECEPTEUR D'EOTAXINE EOSINOPHILE

Publication

EP 1012190 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97925399 A

Priority

  • GB 9700894 A
  • US 9706568 W
  • US 1711396 P
  • US 1615896 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9741154A1] The eosinophil eotaxin receptor has been isolated, cloned and sequenced. This receptor is a human beta -chemokine receptor and has been designated "CC CKR3". The eosinophil eotaxin receptor may be used to screen and identify compounds that bind to the eosinophil eotaxin receptor. Such compounds would be useful in the treatment and prevention of atopic conditions including allergic rhinitis, dermatis, conjunctivitis, and particularly bronchial asthma.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/705; C07K 14/715; C12N 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 51/08 (2006.01); C07K 14/715 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/7158 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9741154 A1 19971106; CA 2252850 A1 19971106; EP 1012190 A1 20000628; EP 1012190 A4 20040428; JP 2002503950 A 20020205; JP 3689118 B2 20050831

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050820

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050209

2004-12-15 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19981126

2004-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981126

2004-04-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040315

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE