Global Patent Index - EP 1012238 A1

EP 1012238 A1 2000-06-28 - PEPTIDES AND PEPTIDE-LOADED ANTIGEN PRESENTING CELLS FOR THE ACTIVATION OF CTL

Title (en)

PEPTIDES AND PEPTIDE-LOADED ANTIGEN PRESENTING CELLS FOR THE ACTIVATION OF CTL

Title (de)

PEPTIDE UND MIT PEPTIDEN BELADENE, ANTIGEN PRÄSENTIERENDE ZELLEN FÜR DIE AKTIVIERUNG VON CYTOTOXISCHEN T-ZELLEN

Title (fr)

CELLULES A PEPTIDES OU A ANTIGENES CHARGES DE PEPTIDES

Publication

EP 1012238 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98906086 A

Priority

  • US 9801959 W
  • US 3669697 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9833888A1] Methods for generating antigen-specific cytotoxic T lymphocytes (CTLs) in vitro are presented in conjuntion with methods for using these CTLs for therapy in vivo. The antigen presenting cells (APCs) used herein notably include dentritic cells pretreated with GM-CSF and IL-4. Antigen-specific CTLs were obtained by incubating CD8 preparations in the presence of APCs that bound desired peptides. IL-7 was generally added at day 1 of the incubation; IL-10 was generally added one day later and during restimulation. The invention also comprises methods for using peptide pulsed dentritic cells to identify novel MHC Class I-restricted tumor antigens and subdominant epitopes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/06; C12N 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 35/26 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 33/06 (2006.01); C12N 5/0783 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/0636 (2013.01); A61K 39/0011 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5158 (2013.01); A61K 2039/57 (2013.01); C12N 2501/23 (2013.01); C12N 2502/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9833888 A1 19980806; AU 6140998 A 19980825; CA 2278189 A1 19980806; EP 1012238 A1 20000628; EP 1012238 A4 20030305; JP 2001509677 A 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020801

2003-03-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030121

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/06 A

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/08 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 9/08 B

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EPIMMUNE INC.

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990812

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE