Global Patent Index - EP 1012253 A1

EP 1012253 A1 2000-06-28 - REACTION SITES FOR MICROORGANISMS USED TO BIODEGRADE CONTAMINANTS AND METHODS OF USE

Title (en)

REACTION SITES FOR MICROORGANISMS USED TO BIODEGRADE CONTAMINANTS AND METHODS OF USE

Title (de)

REAKTIONSSTELLEN FÜR MIKROORGANISMEN, VERWENDBAR ZUR BIODEGRADATION VON KONTAMINANTEN SOWIE VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

SITE DE REACTION DESTINE A DES MICROORGANISMES UTILISES POUR BIODEGRADER DES CONTAMINANTS, PROCEDE D'UTILISATION ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 1012253 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922229 A

Priority

  • US 9809684 W
  • US 4688797 P
  • US 8049098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9851786A1] The present invention relates to a novel reaction site with selected microorganisms capable of biodegrading organic or inorganic contaminants. Contaminants are present in soils (solids), liquids or gases, wherein said contaminants include Federal Priority Pollutants, highly volatile organic compounds (VOCs), recalcitrant organic contaminants or inorganic contaminants such as ammonia or sulfides. The invention particularly relates to biodegradation of organic contaminants by microorganisms from the groups fungus, Nocardioforms/Actinomycetes and Pseudomonadacae, either alone or in combination, which biodegrade the contamination in either the solid/soil, gas/vapor or liquid/water phases; and the transformation of inorganic contaminants, such as ammonia by Nitrosomonas spp. and Nitrobacter spp. to nitrate with optional denitrification, and hydrogen sulfide to elemental sulfur by Beggiatoa spp. and/or Thiosphera pantotropha. Porous media and cord media are used to construct the reaction sites.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 3/10 (2006.01); C02F 3/34 (2006.01); C12N 11/00 (2006.01); C12N 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 3/34 (2013.01); C02F 3/10 (2013.01); C12N 11/00 (2013.01); C12N 11/08 (2013.01); Y02W 10/15 (2015.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9851786 A1 19981119; AU 7482798 A 19981208; EP 1012253 A1 20000628; EP 1012253 A4 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021004

2002-09-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-06-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 02F 3/34 A, 7C 02F 3/10 B

2000-07-12 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB