Global Patent Index - EP 1012257 A1

EP 1012257 A1 2000-06-28 - METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR MAKING AND USING TRANSGENIC DICAMBA-DEGRADING ORGANISMS

Title (en)

METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR MAKING AND USING TRANSGENIC DICAMBA-DEGRADING ORGANISMS

Title (de)

ETHODEN UND MATERIALIEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG TRANSGENER DICAMBA-ABBAUENDER ORGANISMEN

Title (fr)

METHODES ET MATERIELS POUR PRODUIRE ET UTILISER DES ORGANISMES TRANSGENIQUES DEGRADANT DICAMBA

Publication

EP 1012257 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98915256 A

Priority

  • US 9806589 W
  • US 4266697 P
  • US 4294197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845424A1] The invention provides isolated and at least partially-purified dicamba-degrading enzymes, isolated DNA molecules coding for dicamba-degrading enzymes, DNA constructs coding for dicamba-degrading enzymes, transgenic host cells comprising DNA coding for dicamba-degrading enzymes, and transgenic plants and plant parts comprising one or more cells comprising DNA coding for dicamba-degrading enzymes. Expression of the dicamba-degrading enzymes results in the production of dicamba-degrading organisms, including dicamba-tolerant plants. The invention further provides a method of controlling weeds in a field containing the transgenic dicamba-tolerant plants of the invention and a method of decontaminating a material containing dicamba comprising applying an effective amount of a transgenic microorganism or dicamba-degrading enzyme of the invention to the material. Finally, the invention provides a method of selecting transformed plants and plant cells based on dicamba tolerance and a method of selecting or screening transformed host cells, intact organisms and parts of organisms based on the fluorescence of 3,6-dichlorosalicylic acid produced as a result of dicamba degradation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/00; A01H 1/00; A01H 3/00; A01H 4/00; A01H 5/00; C07K 14/79; C12N 9/02; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/29; C12N 15/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/79 (2006.01); C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/02 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/29 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8274 (2013.01); C12N 9/0069 (2013.01); C12N 15/8209 (2013.01); C12N 15/8259 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845424 A1 19981015; AU 6948498 A 19981030; AU 741974 B2 20011213; CA 2285676 A1 19981015; CA 2285676 C 20110308; EP 1012257 A1 20000628; EP 1012257 A4 20040818; EP 2325308 A2 20110525; EP 2325308 A3 20110727; JP 2001519663 A 20011023; JP 2009039123 A 20090226; JP 2010187673 A 20100902; KR 100558838 B1 20060310; KR 20010006014 A 20010115; MX 9909086 A 20000801; NO 324769 B1 20071210; NO 994795 A 19991201; NO 994795 D0 19991001; NZ 338093 A 20010629; RU 2226215 C2 20040327

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20120209

2012-02-09 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050216

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NEBRASKA

2005-12-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEEKS, DONALD P.

2005-12-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WANG, XIAO-ZHUO

2005-12-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERMAN, PATRICIA L.

2005-11-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE BOARD OF REGENTS OFTHE UNIVERSITY OF NEBRASKA

2005-11-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THE INVENTORS HAVE AGREED TO WAIVE THEIR ENTITLEME

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050216

2004-08-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040706

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/00 A

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/09 B

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/29 B

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/82 B

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01H 1/00 B

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01H 3/00 B

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01H 4/00 B

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01H 5/00 B

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 9/02 B

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/79 B

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991018

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT