Global Patent Index - EP 1012260 A4

EP 1012260 A4 2001-05-09 - INTERLEUKIN-20

Title (en)

INTERLEUKIN-20

Title (de)

INTERLEUKIN-20

Title (fr)

INTERLEUKINE-20

Publication

EP 1012260 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98936854 A

Priority

  • US 5287097 P
  • US 6014097 P
  • US 9814609 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9903982A1] The present invention relates to a novel IL-20 protein which is a member of the cytokine polypeptide family. In particular, isolated nucleic acid molecules are provided encoding the human IL-20 protein. IL-20 polypeptides are also provided as are vectors, host cells and recombinant methods for producing the same. The invention further relates to screening methods for identifying agonists and antagonists of IL-20 activity. Also provided are diagnostic methods for detecting immune system-related disorders and therapeutic methods for treating immune system-related disorders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/00; A61K 38/20; C07K 14/54; C07K 16/24; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/03; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/19; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/54 (2006.01); C07K 16/24 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/54 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9849310 A1 19981105 - ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]
  • [X] YAO ET AL.: "Human IL-17: a novel cytokine derived from T cells", J. IMMUNOL., vol. 155, no. 12, 15 December 2000 (2000-12-15), pages 5483 - 5486, XP000602481
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL EMBL; 16 September 1996 (1996-09-16), WUECHNER: "H. sapiens FGFR3 gene, intron 7", XP002161117
  • [T] SHI ET AL.: "A novel cytokine receptor-ligand pair: Identification, molecular characterization and in vivo immunomodulatory activty", J. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 275, no. 23, 23 June 2000 (2000-06-23), pages 19167 - 19176, XP002161114
  • [T] LI ET AL.: "Cloning and characterization of IL-17B and IL-17C, two new members of the IL-17 cytokine family", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 97, no. 2, 18 January 2000 (2000-01-18), pages 773 - 778, XP002161115
  • See also references of WO 9903982A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9903982 A1 19990128; AU 8571198 A 19990210; CA 2296762 A1 19990128; EP 1012260 A1 20000628; EP 1012260 A4 20010509; JP 2001510035 A 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050127

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030918

2001-05-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): FR

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR