Global Patent Index - EP 1012334 A1

EP 1012334 A1 2000-06-28 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING ANTI-VIRAL DRUG SUSCEPTIBILITY AND RESISTANCE AND ANTI-VIRAL DRUG SCREENING

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING ANTI-VIRAL DRUG SUSCEPTIBILITY AND RESISTANCE AND ANTI-VIRAL DRUG SCREENING

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON ANTI-VIRALER WIRKSTOFF SUSZEPTIBILITÄT UND RESISTENZ SOWIE ANTI-VIRALES WIRKSTOFF-SCREENING

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA SENSIBILITE ET LA RESISTANCE VIS-A-VIS DE MEDICAMENTS ANTIVIRAUX, ET CRIBLAGE DE MEDICAMENTS ANTIVIRAUX

Publication

EP 1012334 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98940779 A

Priority

  • US 9815967 W
  • US 90350797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906597A1] This invention provides a method for determining susceptibility for an HCV or HCMV anti-viral drug comprising: (a) introducing a resistance test vector comprising a patient-derived segment and an indicator gene into a host cell; (b) culturing the host cell from (a); (c) measuring expression of the indicator gene in a target host cell, and (d) comparing the expression of the indicator gene from (c) with the expression of the indicator gene measured when steps (a-c) are carried out in the absence of the anti-viral drug, wherein a test concentration of the anti-viral drug is present at steps (a-c); at steps (b-c); or at step (c). This invention also provides a method for determining HCV or HCMV anti-viral drug resistance in a patient comprising: (a) determining anti-viral drug susceptibility in the patient at a first time using the susceptibility test described above, wherein the patient-derived segment is obtained from the patient at about said time; (b) determining anti-viral drug susceptibility of the same patient at a later time; and (c) comparing the anti-viral drug susceptibilities determined in step (a) and (b), wherein a decrease in anti-viral drug susceptibility at the later time compared to the first time indicates development or progression of anti-viral drug resistance in the patient. This invention also provides a method for evaluating the biological effectiveness of a candidate HCV or HCMV anti-viral drug compound. Compositions including resistance test vectors comprising a patient-derived segment comprising an HCV or HCMV gene and an indicator gene and host cells transformed with the resistance test vectors are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12Q 1/70 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/707 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6881 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6897 (2013.01); C12Q 1/701 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/136 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/156 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906597 A1 19990211; AU 8897698 A 19990222; CA 2298102 A1 19990211; EP 1012334 A1 20000628; EP 1012334 A4 20041229; JP 2001512036 A 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090324

2007-03-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025362

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050622

2006-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MONOGRAM BIOSCIENCES, INC.

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050622

2004-12-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041111

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CAPON, DANIEL, J.

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WHITCOMB, JEANNETTE, M.

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PARKIN, NEIL, T.

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE