Global Patent Index - EP 1012353 A1

EP 1012353 A1 2000-06-28 - ALLOY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING OBJECTS THEREFROM

Title (en)

ALLOY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING OBJECTS THEREFROM

Title (de)

LEGIERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN AUS DIESER LEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'OBJETS A PARTIR DE CET ALLIAGE

Publication

EP 1012353 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945174 A

Priority

  • DE 19737957 A
  • DE 19801941 A
  • EP 9805017 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6531089B1] Aluminum alloy containing a fraction of uniformly distributed particles, preferably silicon particles, of less than 20% by weight, so as to increase the wear resistance, prior to processing or machining under hot conditions, and process for producing wear-resistant objects from such an aluminum alloy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 1/10; C23C 4/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/11 (2006.01); B22F 3/115 (2006.01); C22C 1/04 (2006.01); C22C 1/10 (2006.01); C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22C 32/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/043 (2006.01); C23C 4/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/1125 (2013.01); B22F 3/115 (2013.01); C22C 1/0416 (2013.01); C22C 1/1042 (2013.01); C22C 21/02 (2013.01); C22C 32/00 (2013.01); C22C 32/0063 (2013.01); C22F 1/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911834A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IE SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6531089 B1 20030311; AT 228580 T 20021215; EP 1012353 A1 20000628; EP 1012353 B1 20021127; JP 2001515141 A 20010918; WO 9911834 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59806462

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120807

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120808

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120807

2013-04-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110831

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110829

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1012353E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806462

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-09

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 228580

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-07-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HONSEL GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE SE