Global Patent Index - EP 1012353 B1

EP 1012353 B1 2002-11-27 - ALLOY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING OBJECTS THEREFROM

Title (en)

ALLOY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING OBJECTS THEREFROM

Title (de)

LEGIERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN AUS DIESER LEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'OBJETS A PARTIR DE CET ALLIAGE

Publication

EP 1012353 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945174 A

Priority

  • DE 19737957 A
  • DE 19801941 A
  • EP 9805017 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6531089B1] Aluminum alloy containing a fraction of uniformly distributed particles, preferably silicon particles, of less than 20% by weight, so as to increase the wear resistance, prior to processing or machining under hot conditions, and process for producing wear-resistant objects from such an aluminum alloy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 1/10; C23C 4/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/11 (2006.01); B22F 3/115 (2006.01); C22C 1/04 (2006.01); C22C 1/10 (2006.01); C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22C 32/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/043 (2006.01); C23C 4/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/1125 (2013.01); B22F 3/115 (2013.01); C22C 1/0416 (2013.01); C22C 1/1042 (2013.01); C22C 21/02 (2013.01); C22C 32/00 (2013.01); C22C 32/0063 (2013.01); C22F 1/043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IE SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6531089 B1 20030311; AT 228580 T 20021215; EP 1012353 A1 20000628; EP 1012353 B1 20021127; JP 2001515141 A 20010918; WO 9911834 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806462

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120807

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120808

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120807

2013-04-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110831

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110829

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1012353E

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806462 20030109

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228580 T 20021215

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-07-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HONSEL GMBH & CO. KG

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE SE