Global Patent Index - EP 1012360 A1

EP 1012360 A1 2000-06-28 - TEXTILE MACHINE

Title (en)

TEXTILE MACHINE

Title (de)

TEXTILMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE TEXTILE

Publication

EP 1012360 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98920432 A

Priority

  • CH 9800212 W
  • DE 19721163 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19721163A1] The invention relates to a machine for treating textile material having working elements (W1-W4, D1-D4,6) for processing the textile material (F,3) which is fed to the working elements by feeding mechanisms (1,2; 4,5). The machine also has drive elements (A1-A4, 70, 71, 68, 72, 73) for the working elements, and bedding for the drive elements and working elements. During processing, the working elements and drive elements, and their bedding, are accommodated at least partially in separate compartments limited by walls (50, 51, 52, 53, 55, 56; 79, 80, 81, 44). Parts of these working elements protrude into the compartment (90, 91) with the drive elements (70, 71, A1-A4) via openings (58) in the walls (51'). The machine is also equipped with means (64) for applying negative pressure on the compartment (48, 49) with the working elements. The danger with such machines is that negative pressure is also created in the region of the drive elements as a result of the negative pressure applied in the region of the working elements. This results in free-flying fibers (fly lint) and dust being sucked into these areas from the machine surroundings, which soon leads to dirt accumulation in this area. Consequently, the inventive machine is equipped with further means (75, 76) for feeding air into the compartment (90, 91, 92) with the drive elements (A1-A4, 70, 71, 68) or their bedding at a pressure higher than the air pressure around the machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/76; D01G 19/22; D01G 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/76 (2006.01); D01G 19/22 (2006.01); D01G 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 99/005 (2013.01); D01G 15/763 (2013.01); D01G 19/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9853128A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19721163 A1 19981126; CN 1121514 C 20030917; CN 1264436 A 20000823; EP 1012360 A1 20000628; EP 1012360 B1 20030312; WO 9853128 A1 19981126

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070522

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807487 P 20030417

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991110

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI