Global Patent Index - EP 1012361 A4

EP 1012361 A4 2001-05-02 - FAILURE RESISTANT MULTILINE TETHER

Title (en)

FAILURE RESISTANT MULTILINE TETHER

Title (de)

MEHRSEITIGES FESSERESISTANT GEGEN VERSAGEN

Title (fr)

FILIN RESISTANT A LA RUPTURE A LIGNES MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 1012361 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97936009 A

Priority

US 9705840 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848089A1] A tether (Figure 6) having the special technical feature of multiple primary load-bearing lines (601, 603) and normally slack secondary lines (605, 603). These primary and secondary lines are connected together with knotless, slipless interconnections so the tether maintains high strength and some of the lines can be cut without failure of the tether when it is operated near the ultimate failure load of the material from which it is constructed. This tether can safely carry (Figure 31) load hundreds of times longer than prior art tethers in harsh environments where a single-line tether experiences a substantial risk of failure. The specific industrial applications of an electrodynamic tether system to deorbit satellites and a low Earth orbit to lunar surface tether transport system are all part of the general innovative concept of the invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B64G 1/64; D04C 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/50 (2006.01); B64G 1/64 (2006.01); B64G 1/40 (2006.01); B64G 1/42 (2006.01); B64G 99/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/502 (2013.01); B64G 1/648 (2013.01); B64G 1/409 (2013.01); B64G 1/421 (2013.01); B64G 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0627495 A1 19941207 - OPTICAL COATING LABORATORY INC [US]
  • [XA] US 5419516 A 19950530 - LEIPOLD MANFRED [DE], et al
  • [A] JP S58163766 A 19830928 - NITSUTOU SEIMOU KK
  • [XY] FORWARD R L: "Failsafe multistrand tether structures for space propulsion", AIAA/SAE/ASME/ASEE 28TH JOINT PROPULSION CONFERENCE AND EXHIBIT, AIAA 92-3214, 6 July 1992 (1992-07-06) - 8 July 1992 (1992-07-08), Nashville, TN, USA, pages 1 - 15, XP002156118
  • [Y] FORWARD R L, HOYT R P: "Failsafe Multiline Hoytether Lifetimes", 31ST AIAA/ASME/SAE/ASEE JOINT PROPULSION CONFERENCE AND EXHIBIT, AIAA 95-2890, 10 July 1995 (1995-07-10) - 12 July 1995 (1995-07-12), San Diego, CA, USA, pages 1 - 10, XP002156119
  • [Y] FORWARD R L: "Tether Transport from LEO to the Lunar Surface", AIAA/ASME/SAE/ASEE 27TH JOINT PROPULSION CONFERENCE, AIAA PAPER 91-2322, 24 July 1991 (1991-07-24) - 27 July 1991 (1991-07-27), Sacramento, CA, USA, XP002161537
  • [YA] SANMARTIN J R ET AL: "BARE WIRE ANODES FOR ELECTRODYNAMIC TETHERS", JOURNAL OF PROPULSION AND POWER,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF AERONAUTICS AND ASTRONAUTICS. NEW YORK,US, vol. 9, no. 3, 1 May 1993 (1993-05-01), pages 353 - 360, XP000368149, ISSN: 0748-4658
  • [YA] ECKERT A: "SYSTEMSTUDIE UEBER TETHERTECHNIK, TEIL 1", ZEITSCHRIFT FUR FLUGWISSENSCHAFTEN UND WELTRAUMFORSCHUNG,DFVLR. KOLN,DE, vol. 16, no. 5, 1 October 1992 (1992-10-01), pages 283 - 293, XP000321743, ISSN: 0342-068X
  • See also references of WO 9848089A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848089 A1 19981029; AU 3877897 A 19981113; EP 1012361 A1 20000628; EP 1012361 A4 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050430

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030813

2001-05-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010313

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-02-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 64G 1/64 A, 7D 04C 1/12 B

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991109

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE