Global Patent Index - EP 1012364 A1

EP 1012364 A1 2000-06-28 - THREAD CONTROLLING ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

THREAD CONTROLLING ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

FADENSTEUERVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE FIL

Publication

EP 1012364 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936061 A

Priority

  • CH 9800334 W
  • DE 29716100 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: RU2184181C2] textile engineering. SUBSTANCE: zigzag stitch regulating mechanism has at least one lifting device driven for cyclic movement, at least one thread gripper, and at least one regulating device actuated by drive and adapted for selective gripping of thread by gripper. Regulating device is positioned independently of lifting device of gripper. Mentioned mechanism is designed so that regulating mechanism selectively and cyclically moves thread, preferably warp thread, to and from gripper for predetermined shift value inside weaving machine. EFFECT: increased efficiency and improved speed characteristics. 27 cl, 48 dwg

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/20 (2006.01); D03C 9/04 (2006.01); D03C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 13/00 (2013.01); D03C 3/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9913145A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29716100 U1 19971030; AU 8527298 A 19990329; BR 9812628 A 20000822; CN 1079455 C 20020220; CN 1269850 A 20001011; EP 1012364 A1 20000628; EP 1012364 B1 20020522; ES 2174459 T3 20021101; HK 1028430 A1 20020614; JP 2001515967 A 20010925; JP 4167803 B2 20081022; RU 2184181 C2 20020627; TR 200000641 T2 20010521; TW 513498 B 20021211; US 6328076 B1 20011211; WO 9913145 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2014-06-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804205

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130807

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120822

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TEXTILMA A.G.

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080808

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080808

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080807

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080808

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-05-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080807

2009-04-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070814

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070815

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070823

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174459 T3

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804205 20020627

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010704

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE