Global Patent Index - EP 1012366 A1

EP 1012366 A1 2000-06-28 - DEVICE FOR DELIVERING HARNESS ELEMENTS OF A POWER LOOM

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DELIVERING HARNESS ELEMENTS OF A POWER LOOM

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERGABE VON GESCHIRRELEMENTEN EINER WEBMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE TRANSFERER DES ELEMENTS D'EQUIPAGE D'UNE MACHINE A TISSER

Publication

EP 1012366 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98937385 A

Priority

  • CH 9800349 W
  • CH 209497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9913146A1] The invention relates to a device for delivering harness elements (16) from a delivery organ (21) in a drawing in machine for warp ends to carrying organs (19, 20) of a power loom. The invention also contains an ejector (24, 25) for removing the harness elements (16) from the delivery organ (21). In order to construct the inventive device, during which, at the moment of delivery of the harness elements, the carrying organs (19, 20) are aligned as quickly and accurately as possible on said harness elements (16), a guiding roller (1, 30, 31) which is rotationally mounted on an axis (6, 35) is provided for the harness elements (16). Said guiding roller contains the guides (8, 9, 11, 36, 37, 38, 36', 37', 38') for the carrying organ and guides the carrying organ in two orthogonal directions (10, 12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03J 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9913146A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9913146 A1 19990318; AU 8621298 A 19990329; CA 2303223 A1 19990318; CN 1083024 C 20020417; CN 1269851 A 20001011; DE 59806070 D1 20021128; EP 1012366 A1 20000628; EP 1012366 B1 20021023; ES 2186193 T3 20030501; JP 2001515968 A 20010925; PT 1012366 E 20030331; TR 200000650 T2 20000721; TW 396223 B 20000701; US 6199249 B1 20010313

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2005-11-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050819

2004-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030820

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-05-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030819

2004-02-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-08-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-08-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-05-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186193 T3

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806070 20021128

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020115

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT