Global Patent Index - EP 1012370 A1

EP 1012370 A1 2000-06-28 - MEMBRANE WASHING MACHINE

Title (en)

MEMBRANE WASHING MACHINE

Title (de)

MEMBRANWASCHMACHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A LAVER A MEMBRANE

Publication

EP 1012370 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97942717 A

Priority

  • BA 9700001 W
  • BA 970174 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9815681A1] The membrane washing machine comprises a body of the machine (9) in which a membrane (10) is inserted, said membrane having a one-directional valve (22) in its centre and a built-in areation control valve (14) on its top, where the whole upper part of the machine is at the same time the machine cover which, when closed firmly, closes the lower cylindrical body of the washing machine (13) which has a perforated pane (12) suspended from a special ring, and a cone ring (11) placed on the said pane which directs tangentially the water gush pushed by a pump through a pipeline utilizing an electric valve (23) and a one-directional valve (20). When a program controller (2) changes the direction of the pump (16), said pump pushes water upwards above the membrane through a filter (21) and a one-way valve (19), until water is removed from the laundry, and if the pressure increases a safety valve (15) opens and remains opened until the controller changes the direction of the pump. A pressure regulator (4) ensures that no pressure outside the permitted range is generated in the washing machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 15/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9815681A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FI FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9815681 A1 19980416; AT 256213 T 20031215; AU 4446497 A 19980505; BA 97174 A 19990802; DE 69726768 D1 20040122; DE 69726768 T2 20041202; EP 1012370 A1 20000628; EP 1012370 B1 20031210

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERIZOVIC HAJRUDIN

- Effective date: 20041031

2006-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051008

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERIZOVIC HAJRUDIN

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69726768 P 20040122

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR IT LI NL

2003-12-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-03-05 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: FERIZOVIC, HAJRUDIN

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FERIZOVIC, HAJRUDIN

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-07-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR IT LI NL

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990729

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR IT LI NL

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE