Global Patent Index - EP 1012377 A1

EP 1012377 A1 2000-06-28 - KRAFT PAPER AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME

Title (en)

KRAFT PAPER AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME

Title (de)

KRAFTPAPIER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PAPIER KRAFT ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1012377 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98934054 A

Priority

  • SE 9801340 W
  • SE 9702656 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902772A1] A method for making kraft paper, wherein a sulphate pulp is subjected to HC refining only or to HC refining in combination with LC beating, the LC beating, if applicable, being carried out at a relatively low energy supply, and wherein a strengthening agent, especially a charged polymer, is subsequently added to the stock, preferably at two separate points in the process, in a total amount of at least 8 kg per tonne of paper. Kraft paper with a tensile energy absorption index of 2.5-3.5 J/g at a porosity (Gurley) of less than 10 seconds. A valve sack made of one or more layers of said kraft paper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21D 1/20; D21H 21/18; D21H 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21D 1/20 (2006.01); D21F 11/00 (2006.01); D21F 11/02 (2006.01); D21H 11/04 (2006.01); D21H 17/28 (2006.01); D21H 27/10 (2006.01); B65D 65/38 (2006.01); D21H 21/18 (2006.01); D21H 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 11/04 (2013.01); D21D 1/20 (2013.01); D21F 11/006 (2013.01); D21H 17/28 (2013.01); D21H 21/18 (2013.01); D21H 27/02 (2013.01); D21H 27/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902772A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902772 A1 19990121; AT 219536 T 20020715; AU 8365898 A 19990208; BG 104046 A 20000731; BG 63849 B1 20030331; BR 9810569 A 20000919; BR 9810569 B1 20081118; CA 2295075 A1 19990121; CZ 297129 B6 20060913; CZ 9904763 A3 20000816; DE 1012377 T1 20001102; DE 69806168 D1 20020725; DE 69806168 T2 20021128; EE 04531 B1 20050815; EE 200000009 A 20000815; EP 1012377 A1 20000628; EP 1012377 B1 20020619; ES 2147169 T1 20000901; ES 2147169 T3 20021116; HU 0003123 A2 20010228; HU 0003123 A3 20011228; HU 222668 B1 20030929; PL 187952 B1 20041130; PL 337972 A1 20000911; PT 1012377 E 20021031; RU 2208079 C2 20030710; SE 510506 C2 19990531; SE 9702656 D0 19970709; SE 9702656 L 19990110; ZA 9806082 B 19990126

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-02 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20100930

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070707

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070709

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070709

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070707

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070707

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070707

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080107

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070708

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061226

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070707

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-18 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080107

2006-12-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061229

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-18 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-05-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KORSNAES AN (PUBL)

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-05-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UPM KYMMENE OYJ

- Effective date: 20030319

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147169 T3

2002-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-08-21 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19990409

2002-08-14 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19991223

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69806168 20020725

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19991223

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219536 T 20020715

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BILLERUD SKAERBLACKA AB

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASSIDOMAEN SKAERBLACKA AB

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001002

2000-11-02 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2000-09-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147169 T1

2000-08-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19991223