Global patent index - EP 1012383 A1

EP 1012383 A1 2000-06-28 - METHOD FOR CONTROL OF THE CURL OF PAPER IN THE DRYER SECTION OF A PAPER MACHINE AND PAPER OR BOARD MACHINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROL OF THE CURL OF PAPER IN THE DRYER SECTION OF A PAPER MACHINE AND PAPER OR BOARD MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON PAPIERBLATTWELLUNGEN IN DER TROCKENPARTIE EINER PAPIER - ODER PAPPEMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR EMPECHER LE GONDOLAGE DU PAPIER DANS LA SECHERIE D'UNE MACHINE A PAPIER ET D'UNE MACHINE A PAPIER OU A CARTON

Publication

EP 1012383 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98910766 A

Priority

  • FI 9800253 W
  • FI 971301 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9844191A1] The invention concerns a method in the dryer section of a paper or board machine for control of the curl of paper, in which method steam treatment and/or moistening of the paper web (W) is/are employed. In the method, the operations carried out in view of controlling the curl of the paper web (W) are carried out in a number of stages and/or when the web (W) temperature is lower than 85 DEG C, preferably lower than 75 DEG C, and/or when the dry solids content of the web (W) is in the range of K1...K2, wherein K1 = ultimate dry solids content - 7 % and K2 = ultimate dry solids content + 3 %. Further, the invention concerns a paper or board machine, which comprises at least a headbox, a former, a press, and a dryer section, in which steam boxes or moistening devices are employed for control of the curl. There are at least two of said curl regulation devices in view of achieving a regulation of the curl in a number of stages, and/or said curl regulation devices have been fitted to operate in an area in which the web temperature is lower than 85 DEG C, preferably lower than 75 DEG C, and/or the dry solids content of the web is in a range of K1...K2, wherein K1 = ultimate dry solids content - 7 % and K2 = ultimate dry solids content + 3 %.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/00 (2006.01); D21F 5/04 (2006.01); D21F 5/08 (2006.01); D21G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/08 (2013.01); D21F 5/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9844191A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9844191 A1 19981008; AT 329082 T 20060615; AU 6502198 A 19981022; BR 9808431 A 20000523; CA 2284053 A1 19981008; CA 2284053 C 20051122; CN 1101499 C 20030212; CN 1251629 A 20000426; DE 69834820 D1 20060720; DE 69834820 T2 20061109; EP 1012383 A1 20000628; EP 1012383 B1 20060607; FI 971301 A0 19970327; FI 971301 A 19980928; JP 2001503484 A 20010313; JP 3660360 B2 20050615

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69834820

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140328

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110323

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060607

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070323

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070323

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070308

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-09-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060918

2006-09-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060907

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69834820

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-07-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-06-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-06-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060607

2006-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060607

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030730

2001-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALMET CORPORATION(REG.NO.763281)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991027

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE