Global Patent Index - EP 1012386 A1

EP 1012386 A1 2000-06-28 - METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING EVAPORATION DRYING OF PAPER, RUNNABILITY, AND PAPER QUALITY AS WELL AS DRYER SECTION THAT MAKES USE OF THE METHOD IN A PAPER MACHINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING EVAPORATION DRYING OF PAPER, RUNNABILITY, AND PAPER QUALITY AS WELL AS DRYER SECTION THAT MAKES USE OF THE METHOD IN A PAPER MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG VON VERDAMPFUNGSTROCKNUNG VON PAPIER, GESCHWINDIGKEIT , UND PAPIERQUALITÄT SOWIE EINE TROCKENPARTIE EINER PAPIERMASCHINE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'OPTIMISER LE SECHAGE PAR EVAPORATION DU PAPIER, SON APTITUDE AU PASSAGE SUR MACHINE ET SA QUALITE, ET SECTION DE SECHAGE D'UNE MACHINE A PAPIER UTILISANT CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1012386 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917149 A

Priority

  • FI 9800351 W
  • FI 971714 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848107A1] A method and an equipment for evaporation drying of the paper web that comes from the press section (10) of a paper machine. The method consists of three successive stages I, II and III that are carried out in the direction of progress of the web (W) as follows: (I) in the first stage, the paper web coming from the press section (10) of the paper machine is heated in a short section (L1) of the paper machine in the machine direction quickly to a temperature of 55...85 DEG C, and web breaks of the relatively moist and, thus, weak web (W) are minimized; (II) after the first stage (I), the main evaporation drying of the web (W) is carried out so that the evaporation efficiency (PE) and the rate of increase in the dry solids content (KA) of the web (W) are substantially higher than in the first stage or in the final stage (III), and the web temperature (TW) does substantially not rise while the drying proceeds (Fig. 4); (III) in the final stage, the drying is continued with a decreasing evaporation efficiency (Fig. 3) and with such an average rate of increase in the dry solids content (KA) of the web (W) in the machine direction as is lower than in the preceding stage (II) but higher than in a conventional cylinder drying with single-wire draw so that the paper quality can be controlled at the same time.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/04 (2006.01); D21F 5/06 (2006.01); D21F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848107A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848107 A1 19981029; AT 315123 T 20060215; AU 7045998 A 19981113; CA 2287355 A1 19981029; CA 2287355 C 20070313; DE 69833107 D1 20060330; DE 69833107 T2 20060817; EP 1012386 A1 20000628; EP 1012386 B1 20060104; FI 971714 A0 19970422; FI 971714 A 19981023; JP 2001504175 A 20010327; JP 3604704 B2 20041222

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69833107

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060430

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070223

2007-02-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-12-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-04-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-04-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060404

2006-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69833107

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-03-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2006-01-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-01-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031219

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991022

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE