Global Patent Index - EP 1012394 A1

EP 1012394 A1 2000-06-28 - TRACK ARRANGEMENT FOR RAIL-MOUNTED VEHICLES

Title (en)

TRACK ARRANGEMENT FOR RAIL-MOUNTED VEHICLES

Title (de)

GLEISANLAGE FÜR SCHIENENGEBUNDENE FAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

VOIE FERREE POUR VEHICULES SUR RAILS

Publication

EP 1012394 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98946424 A

Priority

  • DE 19741020 A
  • EP 9805377 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19741020A1] The invention relates to a track arrangement for rail mounted vehicles, especially railways, comprising a superstructure with rails arranged on railway sleepers and a ballast bed (24) for supporting said railway sleepers. The superstructure of at least one track is housed in a U-shaped concrete trough extending along the length of the railway and having a base plate as well as, on opposite faces, marginal caps extending upwards and laterally supporting the ballast bed. At least one drain (17) is provided in the trough for draining its inner space. In order to keep subterranean waters from entering the trough simply and reliably, a closing device associated with the drain is provided to at least prevent the water from entering the trough inner space through the drain. The closing device can be a check valve or a shutter mounted in such a way that it is adjustable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 1/00; E01B 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/00 (2013.01); E01B 1/008 (2013.01); E01B 1/001 (2013.01); E01B 1/002 (2013.01); E01B 2204/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914434A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19741020 A1 19990408; AT 239830 T 20030515; AU 9346498 A 19990405; DE 29824458 U1 20010125; EP 1012394 A1 20000628; EP 1012394 B1 20030507; WO 9914434 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808294

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150811

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090825

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090825

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GROTZ GEORG

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080820

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030825

2003-08-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808294 P 20030612

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL