Global Patent Index - EP 1012414 A1

EP 1012414 A1 2000-06-28 - MANHOLE SHUTTERS

Title (en)

MANHOLE SHUTTERS

Title (de)

SCHALUNG FÜR DAS INNERE EINES SCHACHTES

Title (fr)

PANNEAUX DE COFFRAGE POUR REGARDS DE VISITE

Publication

EP 1012414 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944034 A

Priority

  • GB 9802719 W
  • GB 9719423 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914444A1] The invention provides a method for forming a concrete channel between two or more pipes in a manhole base. The method includes the use of at least three pre-formed channel-section shutters (1, 3) to interconnect the pipes. Pre-formed side shutters (5, 7) are used to extend the channel-section shutters upwardly, these side shutters overhanging the channel-section shutters. In situ formed side shutters (53, 61, 55, 63) are used where the channel-section shutters enter the pipe ends. Concrete is applied around the assembled shutters and, after setting, the shutters are removed. A kit for use in the method of the invention is also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914444A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914444 A1 19990325; AU 9171398 A 19990405; EP 1012414 A1 20000628; EP 1012414 B1 20030723; GB 9719423 D0 19971112

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160909

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): GB IE

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020726

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): GB IE