Global Patent Index - EP 1012430 A1

EP 1012430 A1 2000-06-28 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE CLOSURE OF LOCKS

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE CLOSURE OF LOCKS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHLIESSKONTROLLE VON SCHLÖSSERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CONTROLER L'ETAT DE FERMETURE DE VERROUS

Publication

EP 1012430 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97954476 A

Priority

  • DE 19654443 A
  • EP 9707313 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19654443A1] A process and device are disclosed to sense a change in the locking state of a lock (2) or the locking state of a lock (13), which is then stored and if required subsequently treated. In the first case, a movement of rotation of the key (1) is recognised, on the basis of which it is ascertained whether the lock (2) in question has been locked or unlocked. A corresponding signal is transmitted to a memory (8) and display (7) in the key (1) or key ring (19). In the second case, the lock (13) transmits its locking state, preferably by radio, to a memory (8) and/or display (7) in the key (1) or key ring (19). An identification signal for the lock (2, 13) can also be transmitted, and so not only one but several locks can be sensed. The corresponding signals can also be associated to a relative or absolute time.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 19/22; A44B 15/00; E05B 39/04; E05B 41/00; G07C 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/22 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7073 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7085 (2015.04); Y10T 70/8027 (2015.04); Y10T 70/8054 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9829626A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19654443 A1 19980702; AT 226675 T 20021115; AU 5860898 A 19980731; AU 724204 B2 20000914; EP 1012430 A1 20000628; EP 1012430 B1 20021023; US 6255957 B1 20010703; WO 9829626 A1 19980709

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2005-11-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-08-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VERKERHRS-OPTIMIERUNGS-SYSTEME G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-23 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021023

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708583 20021128

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-10-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-10-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-10-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 226675 T 20021115

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020226

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990716

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE