Global Patent Index - EP 1012433 A1

EP 1012433 A1 2000-06-28 - CLOSING BAR FOR A CLOSING DEVICE

Title (en)

CLOSING BAR FOR A CLOSING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSSSTANGE FÜR EINE VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

TIGE DE FERMETURE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE

Publication

EP 1012433 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97942898 A

Priority

EP 9704722 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911894A1] The invention relates to a closing bar for a closing device (10) for doors (2), case shutters or cabinets (1) preferably constructed out of thin wall material such as sheet metal. In addition, the invention is especially for mounting the closing bar in the canted area of sheet metal cabinet doors. According to the invention, the closing bar (12) is displaced from the longitudinal plane (E) thereof by at least one section (A) of the longitudinal length of said closing bar in order to construct a catching element (34) in the area of the middle cross-section (37) of the closing bar profile. The closing bar profile forms a catching surface in the displaced section (A) or adjacent to said displaced section (A) with one of the displaced narrow edges (80) of the closing bar. Said catching surface is overlapped by a receiver (40) arranged on the side of the cabinet and parallel to the closing bar plane (E).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/185 (2013.01); E05C 9/22 (2013.01); E05B 17/0004 (2013.01); E05B 65/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911894A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911894 A1 19990311; DE 59703702 D1 20010705; EP 1012433 A1 20000628; EP 1012433 B1 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59703702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120810

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-11-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59703702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-07-05

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB