Global Patent Index - EP 1012433 B1

EP 1012433 B1 2001-05-30 - CLOSING BAR FOR A CLOSING DEVICE

Title (en)

CLOSING BAR FOR A CLOSING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSSSTANGE FÜR EINE VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

TIGE DE FERMETURE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE

Publication

EP 1012433 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97942898 A

Priority

EP 9704722 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911894A1] The invention relates to a closing bar for a closing device (10) for doors (2), case shutters or cabinets (1) preferably constructed out of thin wall material such as sheet metal. In addition, the invention is especially for mounting the closing bar in the canted area of sheet metal cabinet doors. According to the invention, the closing bar (12) is displaced from the longitudinal plane (E) thereof by at least one section (A) of the longitudinal length of said closing bar in order to construct a catching element (34) in the area of the middle cross-section (37) of the closing bar profile. The closing bar profile forms a catching surface in the displaced section (A) or adjacent to said displaced section (A) with one of the displaced narrow edges (80) of the closing bar. Said catching surface is overlapped by a receiver (40) arranged on the side of the cabinet and parallel to the closing bar plane (E).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/185 (2013.01); E05C 9/22 (2013.01); E05B 17/0004 (2013.01); E05B 65/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911894 A1 19990311; DE 59703702 D1 20010705; EP 1012433 A1 20000628; EP 1012433 B1 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703702

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120810

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703702 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB