Global Patent Index - EP 1012435 A1

EP 1012435 A1 2000-06-28 - PLUG CONNECTOR FOR HOLLOW PROFILES

Title (en)

PLUG CONNECTOR FOR HOLLOW PROFILES

Title (de)

STECKVERBINDER FÜR HOHLPROFILE

Title (fr)

RACCORD ENFICHABLE POUR PROFILES CREUX

Publication

EP 1012435 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98952589 A

Priority

  • DE 29716378 U
  • EP 9805763 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ293531B6] The present invention relates to a plug-in coupling (1) for hollow sections (2, 3) used as spreaders for insulating glass panes, said coupling has a substantially U-shaped or box-like cross section, at least one central wall (10), and side walls (11). At the area of said hollow section (2, 3) connecting point (6) said coupling is provided with stops (17, 18) and run-in bevels (24) that are arranged at the transition point (14) between the sidewalls (11) and the central wall (10). The stops (17, 18), being situated opposite to each another are adapted for a one-sided action and are arranged on both sides of said connecting point (6). The stops (17, 18) have in cross section a convex, outwardly cambered form (25) and on the front side, turned toward the connecting point (6) thy have substantially straight stop edge (19) and on the rear side they are provided with the run-in bevel (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/667

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/667 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/667 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9913192A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29716378 U1 19990128; AT 285506 T 20050115; CZ 20000900 A3 20010711; CZ 293531 B6 20040512; EP 1012435 A1 20000628; EP 1012435 B1 20041222; EP 1531229 A1 20050518; PL 339052 A1 20001204; WO 9913192 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KRONENBERG, RALF M., DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KRONENBERG, MAX, 42657 SOLINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59812417

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-06-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812417

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-04-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812417

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KRONENBERG MAX

- Effective date: 20050930

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050910

2005-07-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041222

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-04-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050402

2005-03-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812417 P 20050127

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-04-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PLUG CONNECTOR FOR HOLLOW PROFILES

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL