Global patent index - EP 1012448 A1

EP 1012448 A1 2000-06-28 - OIL PUMP MODULE WITH FILTER, IN PARTICULAR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE LUBRICATING OIL

Title (en)

OIL PUMP MODULE WITH FILTER, IN PARTICULAR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE LUBRICATING OIL

Title (de)

ÖLPUMPENMODUL MIT FILTER, INSBESONDERE FÜR DAS SCHMIERÖL EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MODULE DE POMPE A HUILE AVEC FILTRE, EN PARTICULIER POUR HUILE LUBRIFIANTE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1012448 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98949991 A

Priority

  • DE 19739668 A
  • EP 9805654 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19739668A1] The invention concerns an oil pump module (11) for assembling in one structural unit, an oil pump (18), an oil cooler (37) and an oil filter (43). Said module has a base element (12) capable of being produced in the form of a plastic housing. An oil pump (18) is inserted from one side and, from the other side, an oil cooler (37) and an oil filter (43). Moreover, the oil pump (18) is sealingly pressed, by the base element (12), against an internal combustion engine frame, so as to be driven by said engine. The invention enables to obtain not only a particularly compact and light oil pump module (11), but also an entire pre-assembled unit, with complete module control at the supplier's.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 1/02; F01M 11/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F01M 11/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/02 (2013.01); F01M 11/03 (2013.01); F01M 2011/035 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9913203A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739668 A1 19990311; EP 1012448 A1 20000628; EP 1012448 B1 20041110; JP 2001515985 A 20010925; JP 4056033 B2 20080305; US 6267094 B1 20010731; WO 9913203 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060907

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060907

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-10-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-09-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050823

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-02-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050221

2005-02-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050210

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812251

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2004-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-11-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041110

2003-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANN + HUMMEL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031017

2001-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FILTERWERK MANN & HUMMEL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000215

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE