Global Patent Index - EP 1012462 A1

EP 1012462 A1 2000-06-28 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN OPERATION PARAMETER FOR THE STARTING OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN OPERATION PARAMETER FOR THE STARTING OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINES BETRIEBSPARAMETERS FÜR DEN START EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER UN PARAMETRE DE FONCTIONNEMENT DESTINE AU DEMARRAGE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1012462 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951277 A

Priority

  • DE 9802656 W
  • DE 19740192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19740192A1] The method involves feeding an initialisation value (I) to a revolution rate controller (1) for starting, followed by controlling the revs. rate (N) towards a desired idling revolution rate (N-SOLL). The control is effected by the revs. rate controller within the engine controller. The initialising value is stored in a characteristic depending on the temp. of the coolant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/062 (2013.01); F02D 41/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914474A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19740192 A1 19990318; DE 19740192 C2 20000316; EP 1012462 A1 20000628; EP 1012462 B1 20010718; WO 9914474 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801051

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090908

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090908

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-07-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801051 20010823

2001-08-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB