Global patent index - EP 1012473 A1

EP 1012473 A1 2000-06-28 - SWIRL DISK AND FUEL INJECTION VALVE WITH SWIRL DISK

Title (en)

SWIRL DISK AND FUEL INJECTION VALVE WITH SWIRL DISK

Title (de)

DRALLSCHEIBE UND BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL MIT DRALLSCHEIBE

Title (fr)

DISQUE DE TURBULENCE ET SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT EQUIPEE DE CE DERNIER

Publication

EP 1012473 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924737 A

Priority

  • DE 9900983 W
  • DE 19815775 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19815775A1] The invention relates to a swirl disk characterized in that it consists of at least one metallic material, has at least one inlet area (65) and at least one outlet opening (69) which is embodied in a lower base layer (62), and at least two swirl channels (66) which discharge into a swirl chamber (68). The swirl chamber (68) is situated in a middle swirl-generating layer (61). An upper layer is configured as a covering layer (60) which across its entire cross-sectional area is a continuous layer without opening outlines. All layers of the swirl disk (30) are placed directly on top of each other by means of galvanic metallisation (multilayer galvanic metallisation). This swirl disk (30) is especially suitable for use in a fuel injection valve, especially a high-pressure injection valve for the direct injection of fuel into a combustion chamber of a spark-ignition internal combustion engine with mixture compression.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/18; F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/1853 (2013.01); F02M 61/162 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953195A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19815775 A1 19991014; EP 1012473 A1 20000628; EP 1012473 B1 20030910; JP 2002504206 A 20020205; US 6695229 B1 20040224; WO 9953195 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-01-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906940

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020828

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI