Global Patent Index - EP 1012474 A1

EP 1012474 A1 2000-06-28 - STICK COIL FOR IGNITION SYSTEMS

Title (en)

STICK COIL FOR IGNITION SYSTEMS

Title (de)

STABSPULE FÜR ZÜNDANLAGEN

Title (fr)

BOBINE DROITE POUR ALLUMEURS

Publication

EP 1012474 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954226 A

Priority

  • DE 9802855 W
  • DE 29800453 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6222435B1] A bar-type coil for ignition systems, in particular, for as an ignition coil in internal combustion engines of motor vehicles, is designed to minimize the interference voltage produced by the ignition processes. The bar-type coil has a core, designed as an I-core, a tubular magnetic return plate, and a primary terminal. Mounted in the primary terminal is, in addition to other elements, a first contact element, which is electrically connected to frame potential. The first contact element is part of a line bar, which is electrically connected via a resistance element or via a laminated strip to the tubular magnetic return plate, so that the interference voltage produced is diverted to frame potential. The bar-type coil may be used in automobile manufacturing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 3/02; H01F 38/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 15/00 (2006.01); F02P 3/02 (2006.01); H01F 38/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/02 (2013.01); H01F 38/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936693A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29800453 U1 19990512; BR 9808022 A 20000308; EP 1012474 A1 20000628; EP 1012474 B1 20030402; JP 2001515565 A 20010918; KR 20000071118 A 20001125; US 6222435 B1 20010424; WO 9936693 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-04-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ERA POWERTRAIN GMBH

- Effective date: 20031224

2004-12-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BREMI AUTO-ELEKTRIKERNST BREMICKER GMBHPATENTANWAE

- Effective date: 20031224

2004-11-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041111

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040917

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BREMI AUTO-ELEKTRIKERNST BREMICKER GMBH

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-11-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807756 P 20030508

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000124

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT