Global Patent Index - EP 1012551 A1

EP 1012551 A1 2000-06-28 - ULTRA-HIGH PURITY BOURDON TUBE PRESSURE GAUGE SYSTEM

Title (en)

ULTRA-HIGH PURITY BOURDON TUBE PRESSURE GAUGE SYSTEM

Title (de)

ULTRAHOCHREINES DRUCKWANDLERSYSTEM MIT EINEN BOURDONROHR

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ULTRA-PUR DE MANOMETRE A TUBE DE BOURDON

Publication

EP 1012551 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98936830 A

Priority

  • US 9814405 W
  • US 5227197 P
  • US 2273198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902955A1] A reduced volume socket body (14) and a reduced volume tube (16) are used in a pressure gauge system in semiconductor fabrication process equipment. The socket body (14) includes an outlet and the tube (16) has an end (16a) connected to the outlet. The outlet is a shaped, weld prep (28) formed on the socket body (14) having an inner surface (22a). A continuous seat (32) is formed on the outlet and includes a seat thickness (S). The tube (16) has an inner wall (38) and an outer wall (36) defining a wall thickness (W) which is substantially the same as the seat thickness (S). The end (16a) of the tube (16) is engaged with the seat (32) so that the inner wall (38) of the tube and the inner surface (22a) of the outlet are substantially aligned to form a crevice free tube-to-socket connection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01L 7/04; B23K 33/00; G01L 19/06; H01L 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01L 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01L 7/041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902955 A1 19990121; AU 8569298 A 19990208; EP 1012551 A1 20000628; EP 1012551 A4 20040428

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060914

2007-02-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028637

2006-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASHCROFT INC.

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-04-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01L 7/04 A

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01L 19/06 B

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01L 21/00 B

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 23K 33/00 B

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DRESSER, INC. (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEFRANCESCO, DAVID, C.

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DONAHUE, BRIAN, T.

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSEN, LOUIS, A.

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TURBEVILLE, JOHN, A.

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BREGY, LOUIS, F.

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE