Global Patent Index - EP 1012619 A1

EP 1012619 A1 2000-06-28 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING AND SIGNALLING A CHANGE IN THE LOCATION OF AN OBJECT

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING AND SIGNALLING A CHANGE IN THE LOCATION OF AN OBJECT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM ERKENNEN UND SIGNALISIEREN EINER ORTSVERÄNDERUNG EINES GEGENSTANDES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETECTER ET SIGNALER UN CHANGEMENT DE L'EMPLACEMENT D'UN OBJET

Publication

EP 1012619 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98949931 A

Priority

  • DE 9802467 W
  • DE 19739772 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9913353A1] The invention relates to a method and system for detecting and signalling a change in the location of an object operated at a fixed site, especially a cash machine or safe, in relation to its place of operation. The location data of the place of operation are stored in a memory. Using a position indicating system the position data of the object are repeatedly determined anew and compared with the stored location data of the place of operation. A signal is triggered if the difference between the two exceeds a predetermined value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01S 5/00 (2006.01); G01S 19/17 (2010.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/0042 (2013.01); G01S 5/0027 (2013.01); G01S 19/17 (2013.01); G01S 2205/002 (2013.01); G01S 2205/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9913353A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9913353 A1 19990318; EP 1012619 A1 20000628

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040707

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF GMBH & CO KG

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000215

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT