Global Patent Index - EP 1012675 A1

EP 1012675 A1 2000-06-28 - TRAIN OF CLOCKWORK WITH PERPETUAL JULIAN DATE

Title (en)

TRAIN OF CLOCKWORK WITH PERPETUAL JULIAN DATE

Title (de)

EWIGE KALENDERUHR

Title (fr)

MOUVEMENT D'HORLOGERIE A QUANTIEME PERPETUEL

Publication

EP 1012675 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98900518 A

Priority

  • CH 9800027 W
  • CH 19197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9834162A1] The invention concerns a train of clockwork with perpetual Julian date, characterised in that it comprises an adjusting device for causing a date indicator (2) to carry out adjusting steps, for automatically taking into account months with 28, 29, or 30 days, said adjusting device comprising a rotating cam (26) driven at least one step every twenty-four hours, said cam (26) having an outline (28) for controlling a sensor (30) bringing about: the oscillating motion of a mobile element (32) provided with a click spring system (34), for moving forward the date indicator (2) by the required supplementary step(s), and the forward movement of said cam (26) for causing it to make the number of steps equal to the number of adjusting steps of said indicator (2) for carrying out one complete round every year.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/24 (2006.01); G04B 19/253 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/2538 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9834162A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9834162 A1 19980806; CH 691086 A5 20010412; DE 69829486 D1 20050428; DE 69829486 T2 20060216; EP 1012675 A1 20000628; EP 1012675 B1 20050323; JP 2001519897 A 20011023; US 6118734 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100126

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100126

2010-04-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051227

2005-08-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69829486 P 20050428

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-03-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990723

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB