Global Patent Index - EP 1012764 A1

EP 1012764 A1 2000-06-28 - A METHOD OF HOLDING AN AUCTION AND USES OF THE METHOD

Title (en)

A METHOD OF HOLDING AN AUCTION AND USES OF THE METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ABHALTEN EINER VERSTEIGERUNG UND ANWENDUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE VENTE AUX ENCHERES ET SES UTILISATIONS

Publication

EP 1012764 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98900850 A

Priority

  • DK 9800040 W
  • DK 10797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9834187A1] The invention relates to a method of holding auctions which take place in a computer environment, where a plurality of sellers (8) and bidders (3) may submit bids from local computers to a central computer (1), a so-called server which may e.g. be coupled via the Internet. The server (1) may offer a catalogue (5) to the indivudual bidders (3) who can then prepare, via their own computers, a prioritized list of the articles which they may possibly desire to buy. The auctioning system incorporates the certainty, via a list of purchase conditions, that a bidder does not risk buying too many articles, or that he will not spend too much money, in the same manner as is known from a traditional live auction. It is moreover noted that the auctioning system may be combined with an ordinary live auction. The auctioning form gives a very advantageous price formation which considers both sellers' and buyers' interests. Furthermore, the auction may take place entirely without geographical limitations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60; H04L 12/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9834187A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9834187 A1 19980806; AT 201272 T 20010615; AU 5652298 A 19980825; DE 69800807 D1 20010621; DE 69800807 T2 20011108; DK 1012764 T3 20010806; DK 10797 A 19970130; EP 1012764 A1 20000628; EP 1012764 B1 20010516; ES 2156435 T3 20010616

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-26 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2005-02-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-12-22 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-12-22 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20040525

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040409

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-22 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040107

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-08-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-06-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-03-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-08-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-08-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800807 20010621

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156435 T3

2001-06-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201272 T 20010615

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GROFTEHAUGE, MARTIN

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GROFTEHAUGE, PETER

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990503

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE