Global Patent Index - EP 1012807 A1

EP 1012807 A1 2000-06-28 - SECURITY AND EMERGENCY ALARM SYSTEM

Title (en)

SECURITY AND EMERGENCY ALARM SYSTEM

Title (de)

SICHERHEITS- UND GEFAHRENALARMSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SECURITE ET D'ALARME EN CAS D'URGENCE

Publication

EP 1012807 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98955743 A

Priority

  • GB 9803378 W
  • GB 9723962 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9926208A1] A multipurpose alarm system suitable for use in large buildings, building complexes or campuses includes a central monitoring station which receives alarm call signals from a plurality of portable transmitter units (2-1, 2-8). Each transmitter unit has a number of alarm call buttons (6-1, 6-4) each capable of initiating an alarm call or a particular classification, according to the type of emergency assistance required by the user. Classifications may include fire, police, ambulance and security services. The transmitter may also transmit the alarm signals with data indicating the identity of the transmitter unit and/or the location of the transmitter unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/10 (2006.01); G08B 25/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/006 (2013.01); G08B 25/016 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9926208A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9926208 A1 19990527; AU 1247599 A 19990607; CA 2308577 A1 19990527; EP 1012807 A1 20000628; GB 9723962 D0 19980107; JP 2001523870 A 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020601

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-07-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE NOTTINGHAM TRENT UNIVERSITY

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE