Global Patent Index - EP 1012809 A1

EP 1012809 A1 2000-06-28 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND DEVICES FOR COLLECTING TRAFFIC DATA

Title (en)

METHOD, SYSTEM AND DEVICES FOR COLLECTING TRAFFIC DATA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR SAMMLUNG VON VERKEHRSDATEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE, SYSTEME ET DISPOSITIFS DE COLLECTE DE DONNEES DE TRAFIC

Publication

EP 1012809 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97909109 A

Priority

CH 9700420 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9924952A1] The invention concerns a method and a system for collecting data concerning traffic on a road network via a telecommunication system, which consists in determining the real positions of the vehicles by a plurality thereof and, in particular, via a mobile radio network (4) in conformity with the GSM standard, by means of short messages (3) transmitted to a traffic data central unit (5) comprising a short message service centre (50) capable of operating special services (51, 52). A special service (51) of the short message service centre (50) processes the received positions and computes the average speeds for predetermined road sections, which are stored in a data bank, in the form of individual time series for the respective corresponding predetermined road sections. Another special service (52) of the short message service centre (50) evaluates the time series of the average speeds for the predetermined road sections, taking into account the traffic jams and supplies to clients corresponding data concerning bottlenecks in the traffic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/0967

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/01 (2006.01); G08G 1/0967 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096716 (2013.01); G08G 1/0104 (2013.01); G08G 1/096741 (2013.01); G08G 1/096775 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924952A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9924952 A1 19990520; AT 200158 T 20010415; AU 4697497 A 19990531; DE 59703258 D1 20010503; EP 1012809 A1 20000628; EP 1012809 B1 20010328; TW 367473 B 19990821

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031013

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031009

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: T-MOBILE TRAFFIC GMBH

- Effective date: 20011221

2003-05-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TEGARON TELEMATICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-02-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TEGARON TELEMATICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-02-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SAMA PATENTS

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-05-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SWISSCOM MOBILE AG

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703258 20010503

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200158 T 20010415

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SWISSCOM AG

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI