Global Patent Index - EP 1012840 A1

EP 1012840 A1 2000-06-28 - A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR TRANSFERRING INFORMATION USING AN ENCRYPTION MODE INDICATOR

Title (en)

A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR TRANSFERRING INFORMATION USING AN ENCRYPTION MODE INDICATOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNG MIT VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSBETRIEBSARTINDIKATOR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE TRANSFERT D'INFORMATIONS METTANT EN OEUVRE UN INDICATEUR DE MODE DE CRYPTAGE

Publication

EP 1012840 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98953748 A

Priority

  • US 9822126 W
  • US 95705197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9922372A1] A method and system for transferring information using an encryption mode indicator (EMI). The present invention provides several secure information communication modes in which data (e.g., representing an audio/visual work) can be transmitted from a source device to a sink device (receiving station) in a number of secure modes. In one secure mode, EMI mode A, the information of the transmission is not allowed to be copied as a whole work; this is the highest level of copy protection. In second secure mode, EMI mode B, the information of the transmission is allowed to be copied once and once only by the sink device. In a third transmission mode, no encryption is used and free copying is availabe. Depending on which secure mode is selected between mode A and mode B, a different encryption process is used by the source device to encrypt the transmission. Further, depending on which secure mode is selected between mode A and mode B, a different decryption process is used by the sink device to decrypt the transmission. The present invention is particularly useful for transmissions between a source device and a bit stream recorder which does not have the capability to extract certain encryption information from a packet header. By using different encryption processes for each transmission mode, an unauthorized device placed between the source and the sink devices that alters the EMI code will be unable to thereafter render or record the audio/visual work because the decryption process selected will differ from the encryption process used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 20/00; H04N 5/913

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/91 (2006.01); G11B 20/00 (2006.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01); H04L 12/40 (2006.01); H04N 5/913 (2006.01); H04N 5/92 (2006.01); H04N 7/167 (2011.01); H04L 12/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/40058 (2013.01); G11B 20/00086 (2013.01); G11B 20/0021 (2013.01); G11B 20/00775 (2013.01); H04L 12/40104 (2013.01); H04L 12/40117 (2013.01); H04N 5/913 (2013.01); H04N 7/1675 (2013.01); H04N 21/2347 (2013.01); H04N 21/4367 (2013.01); H04N 21/4405 (2013.01); H04N 21/8355 (2013.01); H04N 2005/91328 (2013.01); H04N 2005/91364 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9922372 A1 19990506; AT 211575 T 20020115; AU 1103599 A 19990517; CA 2308141 A1 19990506; CA 2308141 C 20040511; DE 69803394 D1 20020228; DE 69803394 T2 20020829; EP 1012840 A1 20000628; EP 1012840 B1 20020102; JP 2001521261 A 20011106; JP 4185248 B2 20081126; TW 406260 B 20000921; US 6223285 B1 20010424; US 7177427 B1 20070213

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-07-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-10-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031019

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-10-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20021031

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-17 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20021017

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-07 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20021007

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-04-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-04-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-04-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803394 20020228

2002-02-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-02 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-02 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211575 T 20020115

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010212

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE