Global Patent Index - EP 1012873 A1

EP 1012873 A1 2000-06-28 - LONG LIFE HALOGEN CYCLE INCANDESCENT LAMP AND GLASS ENVELOPE COMPOSITION

Title (en)

LONG LIFE HALOGEN CYCLE INCANDESCENT LAMP AND GLASS ENVELOPE COMPOSITION

Title (de)

LANGLEBENDE HALOGENIDZYKLUS-GLÜHLAMPE UND GLASKOLBENZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

LAMPE A INCANDESCENCE A CYCLE HALOGENE LONGUE DUREE ET COMPOSITION DE SON ENVELOPPE DE VERRE

Publication

EP 1012873 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944815 A

Priority

  • DE 19747355 A
  • US 9818745 W
  • US 5871297 P
  • US 94856597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914794A1] A long life, halogen cycle, incandescent lamp (30) for operation in excess of 85 volts. The lamp comprises a transparent glass envelope (34) having sealed therewithin a tungsten filament (45); a pair of electrical lead-ins (42, 44) connecting the filament and extending exteriorly of the envelope for connection to a supply voltage greater than 100 V; and a fill gas within the envelope, including a halogen, at a pressure of at least three atmospheres. The envelope is constructed of a five component alkaline earth aluminosilicate glass having a composition consisting essentially of, in weight percent from > 58 to about 64 % SiO2, from about 14 to about 17 % Al2O3; from 0 to about 1 % B2O3, from 1 to about 6 % MgO, from about 6 to about 12 % CaO, from about 7 to about 17 % BaO and from 0 to about 1.5 % ZrO2.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01K 1/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03C 3/085 (2006.01); C03C 3/093 (2006.01); C03C 3/087 (2006.01); C03C 3/089 (2006.01); C03C 3/091 (2006.01); H01J 61/30 (2006.01); H01K 1/28 (2006.01); H01K 1/32 (2006.01); H01K 1/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03C 3/093 (2013.01); C03C 3/087 (2013.01); C03C 3/11 (2013.01); H01J 61/302 (2013.01); H01K 1/28 (2013.01); H01K 1/50 (2013.01); Y02B 20/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914794 A1 19990325; WO 9914794 A9 20050818; AU 9226598 A 19990405; CA 2301579 A1 19990325; CA 2301579 C 20081202; CA 2625915 A1 19990325; CA 2625915 C 20090623; CN 1269910 A 20001011; CN 1316555 C 20070516; EP 1012873 A1 20000628; EP 1012873 A4 20090408; EP 2236470 A1 20101006; EP 2236470 B1 20111109; EP 2374765 A1 20111012; HK 1031950 A1 20080206; JP 2001516952 A 20011002; JP 4323091 B2 20090902

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100615

2010-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2009-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20090625

2009-04-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20090309

2009-04-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C03C 3/085 20060101AFI20090303BHEP

2009-04-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C03C 3/093 20060101ALI20090303BHEP

2009-04-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H01K 1/28 20060101ALI20090303BHEP

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE