Global Patent Index - EP 1012916 A1

EP 1012916 A1 2000-06-28 - CONNECTOR WITH TERMINAL POSITION ASSURANCE MEMBER

Title (en)

CONNECTOR WITH TERMINAL POSITION ASSURANCE MEMBER

Title (de)

VERBINDER MIT KONTAKTLAGEFIXIERUNGSBAUTEIL

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR COMPORTANT UN ELEMENT MAINTENANT LA POSITION DE LA BORNE

Publication

EP 1012916 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98938864 A

Priority

  • EP 98938864 A
  • EP 97402079 A
  • IB 9801352 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9913534A1] An electrical connector (2) has primary locking means formed by terminal locking lances (28) engaging corresponding shoulders (30) of the connector housing (4), and secondary locking means formed by a resilient latch (52, 56) integrally formed with the housing. The secondary latch (52) is secured in the fully locked position by a terminal position assurance member (66), that can only be actuated if the terminals are fully inserted in their respective cavities. Extension of the secondary locking member from an attachment portion (58) directed towards the mating end of the connector, to a free end (60) directed towards a connection end of the connector, ensures that the secondary locking member acts in traction rather than compression. Buckling of the secondary locking member is thus avoided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/422 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4365 (2013.01); H01R 13/4223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9913534A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9913534 A1 19990318; AU 8745298 A 19990329; DE 69804229 D1 20020418; DE 69804229 T2 20020905; EP 1012916 A1 20000628; EP 1012916 B1 20020313

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-07-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69804229

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB