Global Patent Index - EP 1012921 A1

EP 1012921 A1 2000-06-28 - CONNECTOR LOCKING APPARATUS

Title (en)

CONNECTOR LOCKING APPARATUS

Title (de)

VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINES VERBINDERS

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE BLOCAGE POUR CONNECTEUR

Publication

EP 1012921 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98940488 A

Priority

  • EP 98940488 A
  • EP 97115945 A
  • EP 97117806 A
  • IB 9801398 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914825A1] The invention is directed to an apparatus for the locking connection of two parts, in particular two halves of a connector, with a separate locking member with a free end having at least one opening (13) in the first part (10), into which the locking member (15) can be introduced and fixed in such a way that it protrudes with its free end beyond the opening (13), the free end of the locking member (15) having at least one locking lug (19), at least one hole (3) arranged at the second part (1) with at least one complementary lug (6) in such a way that the free end of the locking member (15) can be introduced into the depression and the locking lug (19) and locks behind the complementary lug (6), at least one arm (18), with two opposite ends being part of the locking member (15) whereby said one end is firmly fastened in the opening (13) and said other end bears the locking lug (19) and is mounted in the opening (13) in such a manner that it can be pivoted about a fixed or displaceable pivot point (D), said arm (18) experiencing a deflection between said pivot point (D) and said fixed end when said other end is deflected out of its position of rest.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/627; H01R 13/639

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 13/639 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6275 (2013.01); H01R 13/639 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914825A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914825 A1 19990325; AU 8880798 A 19990405; DE 69803784 D1 20020321; DE 69803784 T2 20020822; EP 1012921 A1 20000628; EP 1012921 B1 20020206

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090909

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-07-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803784 20020321

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010528

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB