Global patent index - EP 1012923 A1

EP 1012923 A1 2000-06-28 - FLOATING CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

FLOATING CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

SCHWIMMENDE VERBINDERANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR FLOTTANT

Publication

EP 1012923 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922982 A

Priority

  • EP 98922982 A
  • EP 97401371 A
  • EP 98108597 A
  • IB 9800842 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858424A1] A connector assembly has first and second connectors (4, 6) that are floatably mountable with respect to frames (20, 80) of devices to enable absorption of positional tolerances during coupling. One of the connectors (6) has guide projections (58) formed by orthogonal tapered walls (64, 66) received within in a shoulder (68) of the mating connector. The projections (58) reduce the cross-sectional surface area required for guiding the connectors together. The connector (6) is releasable from its support frame (80) once the connectors are fully coupled, by camming of the latch (78) during coupling. Large positional tolerances in the mating direction are thus absorbed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/631

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/631 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6315 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858424A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858424 A1 19981223; AU 7543998 A 19990104; DE 69809771 D1 20030109; DE 69809771 T2 20030717; EP 1012923 A1 20000628; EP 1012923 B1 20021127

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69809771

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-09

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010503

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991201

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB